U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40092-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 14, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 14, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 07, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Passport - Return of]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • August 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 02, 2019: [Expedite ]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • May 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • May 15, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 07, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 07, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 07, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • November 16, 2018: [Text Order]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • September 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response]
  • August 19, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 16, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 10, 2018: [Request]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 07, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 03, 2018: [Response]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2018: [Request]
  • August 01, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice]
  • July 30, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 30, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice]
  • July 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 20, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 20, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 19, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 17, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 13, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 13, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.