U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50163
  • Case Name: Clark Lee Bergeson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Adversary Case]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Complaint]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • August 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Employment of Attorney]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.