U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40319
  • Case Name: Judith Ann Larson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.