U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bartholomew
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • July 11, 2019: [Mail Returned]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 28, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 24, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2018: [Extend]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [Suppress]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 28, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 03, 2018: [Response]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Request]
  • July 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice]
  • July 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 16, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.