U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10071
  • Case Name: Benjamin Carl Rethke
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.