U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bull Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 20, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 20, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • January 07, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 29, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 29, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 28, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 11, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 16, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 15, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 15, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 15, 2020: [Consent]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 04, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case & Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Dismiss Count]
  • January 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 16, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 09, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • June 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Reply]
  • March 25, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 11, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 07, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 06, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 22, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 11, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2019: [Suppress]
  • January 03, 2019: [Text Order]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 28, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 26, 2018: [Declaration]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 19, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 17, 2018: [Suppress]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 02, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 30, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 23, 2018: [Request]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • July 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 17, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.