U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50170
  • Case Name: Susanna Amelia Mercado
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (text order)]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • October 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
August, 2021
  • August 29, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
July, 2021
  • July 18, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • September 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.