U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50169
  • Case Name: Jason David Pratt and Sherry Lynn Pratt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (Includes signature of Debtor's attorney)]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Declination]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.