U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40329
  • Case Name: Hultgren Construction LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Post Confirmation Order]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Plan]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Summary]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Amended Disclosure Statement]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Modified Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • April 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Modified Plan]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Striking Document]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement under Rule 9019 (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Sell Property]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement under Rule 9019 (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Sell Property]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Modified Plan]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
November, 2018
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Motion]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Transcript (First Meeting of Creditors)]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [List of Equity Security Holders]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Authority to File - Ch 11]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.