U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 11-40110
  • Case Name: Joseph Anthony Morris
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.