U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cv-05052
  • Case Name: Wiseley v. Department of Social Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • November 18, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 14, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2019: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Supplement]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Letter Received]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 07, 2019: [Letter Received]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • July 27, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 27, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • July 27, 2018: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.