U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-04010
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Dismissal]
  • September 01, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • July 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • July 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • July 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.