U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30038
  • Case Name: Joshua Thomas Cline and April Lynn Cline
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
August, 2018
  • August 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.