U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50182
  • Case Name: Rochelle Yvette Hoover
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.