U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Willis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • December 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Consent]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 14, 2018: [Response]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 31, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2018: [Request]
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • August 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 13, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.