U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Villegas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 29, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 29, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 28, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 09, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.