U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Heer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 14, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 17, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Response]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 15, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 06, 2020: [Forfeiture]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 26, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 20, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 14, 2018: [Response]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 31, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 30, 2018: [Request]
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 21, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • August 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 13, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.