U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Archambeau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 20, 2019: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • February 20, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Verdict]
  • February 20, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 20, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 20, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Executed]
  • February 19, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 19, 2019: [Jury List]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 19, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 18, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 15, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • February 14, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 13, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • February 12, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 12, 2019: [In Limine]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2018: [Response]
  • December 12, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 11, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 11, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 10, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 07, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 05, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 04, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 04, 2018: [Jury List]
  • December 04, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 03, 2018: [Dismiss Count]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Request]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 28, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.