U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herrera-Villanueva
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 31, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response]
  • August 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Request]
  • August 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 08, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 08, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 08, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • August 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.