U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGhee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 10, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 10, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 23, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 28, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 16, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Request]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 29, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 28, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.