U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ghost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 29, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 23, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 04, 2021: [Consent]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 30, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 07, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 12, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 05, 2019: [Reconsideration]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 14, 2018: [Response]
  • September 14, 2018: [Discovery]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Request]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 21, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2018: [In Camera Hearing]
  • August 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 13, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.