U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Castelan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 02, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 21, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.