U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoisington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 26, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • July 20, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 20, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • July 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 24, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 28, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • August 08, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.