U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40373
  • Case Name: Michael Allen Abbas and Lisa Ann Abbas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • July 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (text order)]
  • July 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
June, 2021
  • June 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
May, 2021
  • May 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.