U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mercado-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 05, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 05, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 03, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 10, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.