U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-05003
  • Case Name: The First National Bank of Gordon v. May
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 10, 2020: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 14, 2020: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • December 05, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reschedule (Pre)Trial/Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • November 20, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Objection]
  • October 15, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 01, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
  • September 05, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Subpoena]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Request for Admissions]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Extend Time]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Extend Time]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Interrogatory Answers]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response]
November, 2018
  • November 17, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Interrogatories]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • November 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 04, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • September 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • August 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • August 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.