U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-40247
  • Case Name: Dennis Andre Currie and Cynthia Charmette Currie
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2018
  • September 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
August, 2018
  • August 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.