U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30041
  • Case Name: Heath Gregory Hauptman and Brandee June Hauptman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
January, 2020
  • January 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale (Text Entry)]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (Includes signature of Debtor's attorney)]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.