U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo-Argueta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 07, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 07, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 29, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response]
  • August 20, 2018: [Request]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 13, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.