U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 31, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 21, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 10, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Request]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 05, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 04, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 04, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 04, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Request]
  • September 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 04, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.