U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Charger et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 21, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 02, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 14, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 29, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 22, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 07, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 07, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 07, 2018: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 30, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 30, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 29, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 28, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 15, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • November 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Waiver]
  • November 13, 2018: [Request]
  • November 13, 2018: [Jury List]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2018: [Competency Report]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • August 23, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 20, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 17, 2018: [Request]
  • August 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 16, 2018: [Request]
  • August 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.