U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Babiuk et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 15, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 17, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 16, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 16, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • March 16, 2021: [Transcript]
  • March 16, 2021: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • March 08, 2021: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 05, 2021: [For Order]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 28, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 18, 2020: [Passport - Return of]
  • December 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • November 09, 2020: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • August 21, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 21, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • August 21, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 21, 2020: [Verdict]
  • August 21, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • August 21, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 21, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • August 20, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 18, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 18, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 18, 2020: [Jury List]
  • August 18, 2020: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 13, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 13, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 12, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 10, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 07, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 07, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 06, 2020: [In Limine]
  • August 06, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 05, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 05, 2020: [Exclude]
  • August 04, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • August 04, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • July 24, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 20, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • July 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 05, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Extend]
  • March 23, 2020: [Jury List]
  • March 23, 2020: [In Limine]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 05, 2020: [Reconsideration]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 10, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2020: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 16, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • December 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2019: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 01, 2019: [Reconsideration]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Response]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 08, 2019: [Extend]
  • May 02, 2019: [In Limine]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 30, 2019: [Leave to]
  • April 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • March 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 26, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 21, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 21, 2018: [Seal Existing Document]
  • December 21, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • December 21, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 19, 2018: [Joinder]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Response]
  • September 27, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • September 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 28, 2018: [Joinder]
  • August 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 21, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 14, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.