U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Running
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 06, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 06, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 20, 2019: [Furlough]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 28, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 28, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 28, 2018: [Request]
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 26, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 26, 2018: [Request]
  • November 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 26, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.