U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 14, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 02, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 31, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 31, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 29, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 29, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 29, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • July 27, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 18, 2019: [Letter]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 20, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2018: [Request]
  • September 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 13, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.