U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blaine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 07, 2019: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 18, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2018: [Request]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.