U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 24, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Request]
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Request]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.