U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andrews
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 20, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 04, 2021: [Consent]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 19, 2020: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • May 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 23, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 15, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 01, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 28, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 19, 2018: [Request]
  • November 16, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 16, 2018: [Request]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 15, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 02, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 01, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.