U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paulhamus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Certificate]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 02, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 01, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Request]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 06, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 03, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Request]
  • June 03, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 23, 2019: [Arrest]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.