U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johns
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 02, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 27, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 30, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 25, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 25, 2018: [Request]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 25, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 24, 2018: [Request]
  • September 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2018: [Request]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 28, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.