U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brave
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 18, 2019: [Extend]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 27, 2018: [Furlough]
  • September 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 30, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 30, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 23, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2018: [Request]
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2018: [Request]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.