U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ducheneaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 14, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 19, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Request]
  • August 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 25, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2018: [Request]
  • August 24, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.