U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Wounded
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 18, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 20, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 06, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 16, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 23, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 23, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 23, 2018: [Request]
  • August 23, 2018: [Disclosure ]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.