U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Halfe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 02, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 25, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • September 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 21, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 11, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 04, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 17, 2018: [Request]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.