U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cv-05059
  • Case Name: Grap v. Pennington County Jail
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • November 04, 2019: [Mail Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • August 12, 2019: [Letter Received]
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Supplement]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Letter Received]
  • May 29, 2019: [Letter Received]
  • May 08, 2019: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • May 08, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Supplement]
  • April 10, 2019: [Supplement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Supplement]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Supplement]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 18, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 02, 2019: [Supplement]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 14, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 05, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • August 17, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 17, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.