U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 14, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Supplement]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 29, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 29, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 12, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 09, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 08, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 28, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 20, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 19, 2020: [Supplement]
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • May 05, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 01, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 01, 2020: [Bail Report]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • April 23, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
  • April 17, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 24, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 31, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 06, 2019: [Compel]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2019: [Transcript]
  • November 19, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 19, 2019: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 04, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • October 30, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 24, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 23, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 09, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 09, 2019: [Suppress]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 08, 2019: [Receipt]
  • October 08, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 08, 2019: [Suppress]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 03, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 16, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 29, 2019: [Extend]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 30, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 29, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 25, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 23, 2019: [Response]
  • April 22, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • April 22, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 05, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 05, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 04, 2019: [Add Counts - Superseding]
  • April 04, 2019: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 16, 2019: [Furlough]
  • January 16, 2019: [Reconsideration]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 07, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • November 07, 2018: [Furlough]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 09, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 01, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 25, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 14, 2018: [Response]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2018: [Request]
  • August 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 28, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 28, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.