U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Myosky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 12, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 10, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 15, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 04, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.