U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stertz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Passport - Return of]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 20, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • August 29, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 21, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.