U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Otter Robe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 24, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 07, 2019: [Extend]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 20, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 20, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 07, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Request]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 01, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2018: [Arrest]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.