U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mung
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • July 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 02, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 01, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • October 07, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 07, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 07, 2019: [Transcript]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 28, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 21, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 21, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 20, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Verdict]
  • March 01, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 01, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • March 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 01, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • February 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 26, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 26, 2019: [Jury List]
  • February 26, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 25, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2019: [Reply]
  • February 12, 2019: [Brief]
  • February 11, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 05, 2019: [Brief]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 04, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 04, 2019: [In Limine]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 31, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 31, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.