U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bungert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 02, 2020: [Furlough]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 22, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 22, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 21, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 22, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.